THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:23:21 PM
Pytyck, Jennifer Monique
CPSO#:
86485
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre
For Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MONIQUE PYTYCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYTYCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2013 |