THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:52:59 AM
Yao, Shao Yee
CPSO#:
86446
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2012 |