THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:42:55 AM
Hodgson, Todd Robert
CPSO#:
86425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L&G Community Health Team
2235 Parkedale Avenue
Brockville ON K6V 6B2
Phone: (613) 342-4076
Fax: (613) 342-6578
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TODD ROBERT HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2020 |