THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:39:15 PM
Phaneuf, Marie-Rose Paule
CPSO#:
86417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1840 Woodward Drive
Medsleep Ottawa
Unit 2A
Ottawa ON K2C 0P7
Phone: 6137229900
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE-ROSE PAULE PHANEUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHANEUF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 17 Mar 2012 to 16 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2013 |