THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 8:23:14 AM
Gonzalez-Almeyda, Roberto
CPSO#:
86416
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1300
Fax: (519) 322-1322
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERTO GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |