THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:25:07 AM
Salmasi, Ghazal
CPSO#:
86366
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:259 States St
San Francisco CA 94114
Date Received: 27 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:18 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2019 |