THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:59:56 AM
Baig, Jeremy David
CPSO#:
86327
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:18 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEREMY DAVID BAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 18 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 19 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2016 |