THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 5:59:39 AM
Cypel, Marcelo
CPSO#:
86294
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
North Wing Room 9N 969
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5156
Fax: 416 3403478
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
|
Active |