THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:36:02 AM
Costa, Giuseppe
CPSO#:
86293
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
Phone: 5193721111
Fax: 5193721112
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:09 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 21 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2016 |