THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:47:44 PM
Warren, Heather Mary
CPSO#:
86288
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER MARY WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jun 2007 to 01 Jul 2007
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2010 |