THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:27:29 AM
Haykal, Siba
CPSO#:
86255
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIBA HAYKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYKAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2017 |