THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:15:27 AM
Gillis-Doyle, Jennifer Anne
CPSO#:
86246
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gillis-Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Sep 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2015 |