THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:47:53 PM
Schweitzer, Kelly Donald
CPSO#:
86193
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kelly Schweitzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock St. Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2015 |