THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:41:16 PM
Izenberg, Aaron Efrem
CPSO#:
86186
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1-600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 4804475
Fax: 4164804674
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Izenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON EFREM IZENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZENBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2013 |