THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:15:52 PM
Sood, Rickesh
CPSO#:
86180
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2702
Fax: (519) 942-0483
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICKESH SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2007 |