THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:22:52 AM
Alobaid, Abdullah Omar A
CPSO#:
86163
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 03 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Jul 2007 to 03 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Jul 2008 to 03 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Jul 2009 to 03 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Jul 2010 to 03 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Jul 2011 to 03 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2014 |