THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:25:22 PM
Al-Saigh, Basil Behnam
CPSO#:
86161
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Finch Weston Family Health Organiza
2367 FInch Avenue West - Unit B
Toronto ON M9M 2W8
Phone: (416) 900-6697
Fax: (416) 900-6041
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BASIL BEHNAM AL-SAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAIGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 24 Jun 2007
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2010 |