THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:02:00 PM
Kriegel Perez, Graciela Ruth
CPSO#:
86154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055 Ext. 6016
Fax: (905) 430-4463
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Argentina
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRACIELA RUTH KRIEGEL PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIEGEL PEREZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2013 |