THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:02:59 PM
Murphy, Colm Joseph
CPSO#:
86145
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
22 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 24 May 2007 to 31 May 2007
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 06 Aug 2007
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 07 Aug 2007 to 09 Aug 2007
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 20 Aug 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2007 |