THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:07:13 AM
Roifman, Idan
CPSO#:
86124
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M315b
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IDAN ROIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROIFMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 May 2007 to 08 Jun 2007
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2010 |