THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:56:06 AM
Babwah, Jesse Paul
CPSO#:
86123
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Crt
Dynacare Laboratories
Department of Pathology
Brampton ON L6T 5M3
Phone: 888.497.4711
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSE PAUL BABWAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABWAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2013 |