THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:15:08 AM
Ilo, Mary de Porres
CPSO#:
86107
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Apr 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Igbo, Italian
Education: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 5858
Fax: (519) 751-5570
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site |
Paris |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY DE PORRES ILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2007 |