THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:55:47 AM
Mosli, Mahmoud Hisham Ahmed
CPSO#:
86099
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mahmoud Mosli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 28 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2007 to 04 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2016 |