THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:08:25 AM
Adekoya, David Adekunle
CPSO#:
86082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State University of New York-Stony Brook, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:09 Oct 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ADEKUNLE ADEKOYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEKOYA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Mar 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2011 |