THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:02:45 PM
Shin, Sharon Lee
CPSO#:
86061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:16 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON LEE SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
EL - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |