THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:07:42 AM
AlAwamy, Mohammed Baker H
CPSO#:
86053
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Baker H. AlAwamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2020 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |