THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:39:08 PM
Qutub, Mohammed Ahmed Hasan
CPSO#:
86049
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
16 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2007 to 25 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 02 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jul 2015
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2018 |