THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:35:20 PM
Matava, Clyde Tonderayi
CPSO#:
86046
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Matava, Cliade Tonderayi (used until: 07 Mar 2012 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Zimbabwe, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:12 Sep 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2008 to 13 May 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 14 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |