THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:42:13 AM
Kalantari, Saeed
CPSO#:
86026
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 730-1300
Fax: (416) 730-0600
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
|
Active |