THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:52:27 AM
Alhouti, Ahmad M A M E
CPSO#:
86025
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 20 May 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 25 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2012 to 25 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |