THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:41:51 PM
Larche, Margaret Jean
CPSO#:
86015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 702
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 528-0489
Fax: (905) 528-0450
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:13 Mar 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:13 Mar 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2016 |
|
Active |