THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:06:54 AM
Bariana, Sam Singh
CPSO#:
86010
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
860 North Park Drive
Brampton ON L6S 4N5
Phone: (905) 463-2095
Fax: (905) 463-2096
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jan 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAM SINGH BARIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARIANA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2009 |