THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:13:26 PM
Mathew, George
CPSO#:
86009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tower C
Suite 117
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-2811 Ext. 8607
Fax: (613) 775-0095
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. George Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 12 Mar 2007 to 25 May 2007
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 26 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jul 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |