THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:18:56 PM
Roche, Susan Lucy
CPSO#:
85973
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Congenital Cardiac Centre
Department of Cardiology
5N 521 - 585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3266
Fax: (416) 340-5014
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2019 |
|
Active |