THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:14:03 AM
Singh, Jagdeep
CPSO#:
85963
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:09 Oct 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 15, 2020, Dr. Singh has completed all components of this SCERP dated March 23, 2017.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 15, 2020, Dr. Singh has completed all components of this SCERP dated March 23, 2017.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)