THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:40:17 AM
Al-Kudmani, Basheer Subhi B
CPSO#:
85953
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:20 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 02 Mar 2007
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2016 |