THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:14:51 AM
Tbakhi, Abdelghani Issa A
CPSO#:
85950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Jordan, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9052089058
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:14 Aug 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Dec 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
|
Active |