THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:46:35 PM
Haney, Elizabeth Anne
CPSO#:
85947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
c/o Dept of Emergency Medicine:
LHSC
E1-125 : 800 Commissioners Rd. E.
London ON N6C 2V5
Phone: 519 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |