THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:41:02 AM
Hopyan, Julia Jasmine
CPSO#:
85935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Batmanian, Julia Jasmine (used until: 04 Mar 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
Room A455
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4473
Fax: (416) 480-5753
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:28 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIA JASMINE HOPYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2007 to 06 May 2007
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 07 May 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Feb 2009
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |