THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:52:46 PM
Nethirasigamani, Dinesh
CPSO#:
85925
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 5197840085
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DINESH NETHIRASIGAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NETHIRASIGAMANI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |