THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:23:08 PM
Sudhakaran Nair, Gopakumar
CPSO#:
85923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-800 Commissioners Rd W
Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology and pa
c2-168
London ON N6K 1C2
Phone: 519.685.8500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GOPAKUMAR SUDHAKARAN NAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDHAKARAN NAIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 16 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |