THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:23:25 AM
Woodhouse, Douglas Charles
CPSO#:
85921
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:WPSHC
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2007 to 26 Feb 2007
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |