THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:37:54 AM
Wong, Alexander Chung Hun
CPSO#:
85920
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Sep 2009 to 11 Oct 2009
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
EL - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2012 |