THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:50:10 PM
Hegazy, Ahmed Fathy Mohamed
CPSO#:
85918
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Al Takhassusi Street
King Faisal Specialist Hospital & R
Adult Critical Care Medicine
P.O.Box 3354 Maather
al-Riyad 12713
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 540790233
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Saudi Arabia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED FATHY MOHAMED HEGAZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGAZY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Mar 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
CF - Neuroanaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2011 to 22 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2013 |