THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:35:43 AM
Apichatibutra, Narisa
CPSO#:
85912
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Mahidol University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 31 Mar 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2008 |