THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:40:42 AM
Honjo, Osami
CPSO#:
85905
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: Shimane Ikadaigaku, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6420
Fax: (416) 813-7984
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:12 Aug 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
|
Active |