THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:23:41 PM
Salama, Magdy Gamil Abdou
CPSO#:
85904
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
2221 Keele street.
North York ON
M6M3Z5
Toronto ON M6M 1B9
Phone: (416) 656-6515
Fax: (416) 656-6815
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2011 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Oct 2011
Summary:
On October 14, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in conducting research.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitation on Dr. Salama(s certificate of registration:
I) Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of any kind at any time; and
ii) Dr. Salama shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an education program in medical ethics and informed consent organized and approved by the College.
2. Dr. Salama appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Salama pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30 days from the date of this Order.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 14, 2011