THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:01:29 PM
Wheatley-Price, Paul Francis
CPSO#:
85877
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2007 to 05 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
|
Active |