THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:30:37 PM
Grantcharov, Teodor Pantchev
CPSO#:
85854
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bulgarian, Danish, English
Education: Pavlov Academy of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Teodor P. Grantcharov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 23 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |