THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:55:50 PM
Averns, Henry Lloyd
CPSO#:
85851
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1528 Sydenham Road
Kingston ON K7L 4V4
Phone: (613) 507-7878
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:29 May 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
|
Active |